skip to content

Dyason, Claire Guinevere

CPSO#: 91148

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Palliative Care Office
The Ottawa Hospital - General Site
501 Smyth Road, Ottawa ON
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8899 Ext. 75648
Fax: 613-739-6890 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

IGFCC
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 6137378899 Ext. 25135
Fax: 613 739 6890
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CLAIRE GUINEVERE DYASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYASON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013