skip to content

Dwyer, Tim

CPSO#: 94194

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6482
Fax: (416) 323-6483 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mt Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6482
Fax: (416) 323-6483
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tim Dwyer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TIM DWYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DWYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011