Dworak, Andrew Stanley Charles (CPSO#: 21335)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 09 Feb 2019

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Feb 2019

Summary

Date of Death: 9-Feb-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1968
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 09 Feb 2019