skip to content

Dwivedi, Girish

CPSO#: 96790

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Feb 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Delhi, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Girish Dwivedi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 09 Sep 2011 to 09 Nov 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 10 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2017