skip to content

Dwilow, Rachel Ann

CPSO#: 91420

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Sep 2015
EXPIRY DATE
21 Sep 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:18 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 27 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 28 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 25 Aug 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
EL - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2015