skip to content

Duwyn, Rejean Paul

CPSO#: 86518

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2- 414 Main St
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone: 519-583-2225
Fax: 519-583-2250 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rejean Duwyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Duwyn ( CPSO# 86518 )

Business Address:
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 429-6975

Business Address:
807 St. George Street
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 583-2225

Business Address:
PO Box 1108
2-414 Main Street
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone Number: 5195832225

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REJEAN PAUL DUWYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUWYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009