skip to content

Dutta, Usha

CPSO#: 94997

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 May 2011 to 01 Jun 2011
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 02 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2013