skip to content

Dutchak, Peter Anthony

CPSO#: 90389

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective:24 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2017
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2019