skip to content

Durant, Craig David

CPSO#: 89081

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. Craig Durant
464 Welland Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2M 5V4
Phone: 905-984-6402
Fax: 905-228-0822 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. C. Durant & J. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Durant ( CPSO# 89081 )
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 89332 )

Business Address:
464 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2M 5V4
Phone Number: (905) 984-6402

Business Address:
2 Lakeshore Road
Suite 5
St Catharines ON  L2N 7E4
Phone Number: (905) 937-2220

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CRAIG DAVID DURANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2015