Dupuis, Alissa Mary (CPSO#: 92969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2440
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alissa Dupuis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dupuis ( CPSO# 92969 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 797-6133

Business Address:
120-1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone Number: (613) 523-7822

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISSA MARY DUPUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUPUIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014