skip to content

Duong, Hanh Heather

CPSO#: 97036

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306, 220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N8M7
Phone: 9056659001
Fax: 9056659335 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 2703
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hanh Duong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Duong ( CPSO# 97036 )

Business Address:
306 - 220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone Number: (905) 665-9001

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HANH HEATHER DUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
EL - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
EL - Paediatric Nephrology

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
EL - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 18 Oct 2013
EL - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2014