Duong, Alex Kinlap (CPSO#: 90488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
876 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L3
Phone: (613) 742-8182
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Waters Duong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Duong ( CPSO# 90488 )
Dr. E. Waters ( CPSO# 92919 )

Business Address:
Carson Medical Clinic
Unit E
876 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L3
Phone Number: (613) 742-8182

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEX KINLAP DUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011