skip to content

Dunn, Jessica Katherine Elizabeth

CPSO#: 93929

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Boston University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alberta Children's Hospital
Section of Infectious Diseases
28 Oki Drive NW
Calgary AB  T3B 6A8
Phone: 4039557505
Fax: 4039553045

Additional Practice Location(s)

Newborn Screening Ontario
CHEO
415 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M8
Canada
Phone: 613-738-3222
Fax: 613-738-0853
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA KATHERINE ELIZABETH DUNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 18 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 14 Jul 2017
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2015