skip to content

Dunn, James Michael

CPSO#: 21626

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 12 Jan 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Mar 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Sep 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 May 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Nov 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1986
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jan 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jan 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Jan 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1988
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 28 Feb 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Jan 1998