skip to content

Dunlap, Hal Joseph

CPSO#: 31097

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Aug 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hal Dunlap Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario 401 Smyth Road Ottawa, ON K1H8L1
Date Received: 20 Apr 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:13 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020