skip to content

Duncombe, Jayde Calah

CPSO#: 96913

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
OakMed Family Health Team
Suite 110
231 Oak Park Boulevard
Oakville ON  L6H 7S8
Phone: (905) 901-5111
Fax: (905) 901-5122 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jayde Duncombe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Duncombe ( CPSO# 96913 )

Business Address:
OakMed Family Health Team
Suite 110
231 Oak Park Boulevard
Oakville ON  L6H 7S8
Phone Number: (905) 901-5111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAYDE CALAH DUNCOMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNCOMBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 23 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jan 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2013