skip to content

Duncan, Kaitlin Collier Claire

CPSO#: 100602

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Oct 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor Harry Medovy House
671 William Avenue
Max Rady College of Medicine
University of Manitoba
Winnipeg MB  R3E0Z2
Phone: 204-787-1125

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAITLIN COLLIER CLAIRE DUNCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNCAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2018