skip to content

Duncan, Charles George

CPSO#: 22961

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Oct 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Oct 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Oct 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Other
Active Date: December 17, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
BAIL CONDITIONS

On December 17, 2019, the following conditions of release (bail conditions) were imposed on Charles Duncan:
1. Specified address, with your surety, and not change that residence without the prior consent of the court
2. Do not contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly by any physical, electronic or other means with specified persons or any member of their immediate family
3. Do not be within 50 metres of any place where you know specified persons to live, work, go to school, frequent or any place you know the person(s) to be EXCEPT for incident contact required for court appearances.
4. Do not be in the company of or communicate, directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means with males or females under the age of 16 years, unless in the direct presence of your surety
5. Do not attend a public park or public swimming area where persons under the age of 16 years are present or can reasonably be expected to be present, or a daycare centre, school ground, playground or community centre unless in the direct presence of your surety
6. Do not seek, obtain or continue with any paid or unpaid activity that involves being in a position of trust or authority towards persons under the age of 16 years
7. Do not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code

 

Source: Other
Active Date: November 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CHARGES

Charles Duncan was charged with the following offences:
1. Sexual Assault, in 2016, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Sexual Exploitation of a young person, in 2016, by directly or indirectly touching the body of the person with a part of his body for a sexual purposes contrary to Section 153(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada
3. 2 counts of Sexual Assault, or on about June 2009, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charge: November 6, 2019
Place of charge: St. Catherines, Ontario
Niagara Regional Police

 

Source: Member
Active Date: August 22, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Charles George Duncan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 22, 2019:

College Investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Duncan engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent in his family medicine practice. In the face of these Investigations, Dr. Duncan resigned from the College, effective October 31, 2019, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)