skip to content

Dunbar, Christine Lilian

CPSO#: 26865

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Aug 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dunbar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: 229 Major St Toronto, ON M5S 2L5
Date Received: 03 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:18 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020