skip to content

Dumas, Matthew George

CPSO#: 96319

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakelands Family Health Team
12357 Highway 41
R.R # 1
Northbrook ON  K0H 2G0
Phone: 613-336-8888
Fax: 613-336-2819 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

31 Central Street
Denbigh ON  K0H 1L0
Canada
Phone: (613) 333-1333
Fax: (613) 333-1263
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW GEORGE DUMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUMAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2014