skip to content

Dumais, Valerie Simonne

CPSO#: 86252

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury and District
General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Fax: (613) 636-6175 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

179 OldHwy 17
PO Box 305
Plantagenet ON  K0B1L0
Canada
Phone: 613-673-4318
Fax: 613-673-4480
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

4553 St Catherine St
St Isidore Des Prescott ON  K0C2B0
Canada
Phone: 6135243225
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. V. Dumais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dumais ( CPSO# 86252 )

Business Address:
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Business Address:
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Phone Number: (705) 337-6111

Business Address:
179 Old Highway
Plantagenet ON  K0B 1L0
Phone Number: (613) 673-4318

Business Address:
4553 Ste-Catherine
St Isidore ON  K0C 2B0
Phone Number: (613) 524-3225

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:16 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VALERIE SIMONNE DUMAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUMAIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2013