skip to content

Dullege, Suzanne Marie

CPSO#: 88594

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Central Hastings Family Health Team
Tri-Area Medical Centre
52 St Lawrence Street
Madoc ON  K0K 2K0
Phone: (613) 473-4134
Fax: (613) 473-4740 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Suzanne Dullege Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dullege ( CPSO# 88594 )

Business Address:
Central Hastings Family Team Madoc
Tri-Area Medical Centre
52 St. Lawrence Street
Madoc ON  K0K 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 473-4134

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUZANNE MARIE DULLEGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DULLEGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2011