skip to content

Dukhovny, Stanislav

CPSO#: 95698

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 55
7600 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8B7
Phone: (289) 371-3500
Fax: (289) 371-3399 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 19
1118 Centre St.
Thornhill ON  L4J7R9
Canada
Phone: 9054799902
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2 Bloor St. W
Toronto ON  M4W3E2
Canada
Phone: 4163235793
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 901
505 Consumers Rd
North York ON  M2J4V8
Canada
Phone: 4166313000
Fax: 4166310613
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Dukhovny Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dukhovny ( CPSO# 95698 )

Business Address:
2 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M4W 3E2
Phone Number: (416) 323-5793

Business Address:
Suite 55
7600 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8B7
Phone Number: (289) 371-3500

Business Address:
505 Consumers Road
Suite 901
North York ON  M2J 4V8
Phone Number: (416) 631-3000

Business Address:
1118 Centre Street
Suite 19
Thornhill ON  L4J 7R9
Phone Number: (905) 479-9902

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STANISLAV DUKHOVNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUKHOVNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013