skip to content

Duhaime, Suleena Kristy

CPSO#: 87017

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 rue Old St Patrick
Ottawa ON  K1N 9G4
Phone: (613) 241-3013 Ext. 4
Fax: (613) 241-4482 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hopital Montfort Hospital
713 rue Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Suleena Duhaime Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duhaime ( CPSO# 87017 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
500 Old St. Patrick
Ottawa ON  K1N 9G4
Phone Number: (613) 241-3013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SULEENA KRISTY DUHAIME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUHAIME is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013