Duggan, Daniel Robert (CPSO#: 99485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Duggan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Duggan ( CPSO# 99485 )

Business Address:
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Business Address:
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL ROBERT DUGGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2015