skip to content

Duero Posada, Juan Guillermo

CPSO#: 89833

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Valle, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
McLaughlin Pavilion 5 - 420B
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5386
Fax: (416) 603-5083 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

N C S B 11 C 1188
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G2N2
Canada
Fax: 4163404012
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUAN GUILLERMO DUERO POSADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUERO POSADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
PEAP - CF - Neurology

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013