skip to content

Dudok, David Vladimir

CPSO#: 91384

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Eye Care Centre
3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone: (905) 684-8521
Fax: (905) 684-4996 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ocular Health Centre
31 Kingsbury Dr
Kitchener ON  N2A 2L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 208-8104
Fax: (519) 208-8101
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David V. Dudok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dudok ( CPSO# 91384 )

Business Address:
31 Kingsbury
Kitchener ON  N2A 2L9
Phone Number: (519) 742-1313

Business Address:
3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone Number: (905) 684-8521

Business Address:
South Walkviller Medical centre
Suite 200
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 258-0162


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID VLADIMIR DUDOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUDOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2015