skip to content

Dudebout, Jill Jacqueline

CPSO#: 85945

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Cancer Center of
Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4501
Fax: (613) 546-8201 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lennox & Addington General Hosp
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R2Z4
Canada
Phone: 6133543301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. A. Thakrar and J. Dudebout Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dudebout ( CPSO# 85945 )
Dr. A. Thakrar ( CPSO# 85955 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Cancer Centre Of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Brock 2
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
LACGH
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Drive
PO Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (613) 658-4544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:06 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JILL JACQUELINE DUDEBOUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUDEBOUT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 19 Feb 2007 to 09 Mar 2007
EL - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011