skip to content

Dubois, Carla Dawn Marie

CPSO#: 95469

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aurora Family Health Clinic
971 Carrick St
Thunder Bay, ON
P7B 6L9
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6L9
Phone: (807) 285-1894
Fax: (807) 285-2098 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carla Dubois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dubois ( CPSO# 95469 )

Business Address:
Aurora Family Health Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6L9
Phone Number: (807) 285-1894

Business Address:
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CARLA DAWN MARIE DUBOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBOIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013