Du, Cindy Shiuchin (CPSO#: 101141)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Alberta, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Danforth Greenwood Walk In Clinic 1188 Danforth Ave Toronto, ON M4J 1M3
Date Received: 21 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2018