skip to content

Drzewiecki, Anna Elizabeth

CPSO#: 31736

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:26 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 1994