skip to content

Drury, Robert Donald

CPSO#: 27470

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 1975
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert D. Drury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 24 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT DONALD DRURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRURY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2019