skip to content

Driscoll, Michelle Laurette

CPSO#: 93546

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1811 St-Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 7C6
Phone: (613) 590-0533
Fax: (613) 590-7351 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michelle Driscoll Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Driscoll ( CPSO# 93546 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
2784 Laurier Street
Rockland ON  K4K 1A2

Business Address:
1181 St Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 7C6
Phone Number: (613) 590-0533

Business Address:
3171 Strandherd Drive
Nepean ON  K2J 5N1
Phone Number: (613) 706-0984

Business Address:
1600 Merivale Road
Nepean ON  K2G 5J8
Phone Number: (613) 706-1908

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LAURETTE DRISCOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRISCOLL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013