skip to content

Drewniak, Magdalena

CPSO#: 94249

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 26 Jul 2010 to 13 Aug 2010
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 14 Aug 2010 to 27 Aug 2010
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2010