skip to content

Dresser, Carl Kenneth

CPSO#: 16158

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Indonesian

Education:Queen's University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Dec 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005