skip to content

Drca, Dragoslav

CPSO#: 92350

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primary Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Orléans ON  K4A 5E6
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: (613) 841-0106 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dragoslav Drca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Drca ( CPSO# 92350 )

Business Address:
Primary Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K4A 5E6
Phone Number: (616) 841-7009


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Connecticut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:24 Dec 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2011 Active
 Dr.  Dragoslav  Drca  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  primary care,
            excluding paediatrics and obstetrics.