skip to content

Drakhshan, Afrooz

CPSO#: 91362

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Derakhshan Chaleshtari, Afrooz (used until: 14 Apr 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Shahr-E-Kord University of Med Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
300 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 1A1
Phone: (905) 597-6100
Fax: (905) 597-6111 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Drakhshan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Drakhshan ( CPSO# 91362 )

Business Address:
Suite 10
300 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 597-6100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AFROOZ DRAKHSHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAKHSHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 27 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011