skip to content

Drake, Robert Michael

CPSO#: 20507

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 16 Oct 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Oct 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Date of Death: 16-Oct-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For copies of medical records please contact Honey Alzner at 519-819-1000.
Date Received: 18 Oct 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1966
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2017
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 16 Oct 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: August 31, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Michael Drake to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 31, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Drake’s recordkeeping in his work as a psychotherapist. Dr. Drake has ceased to practice as a psychotherapist and has limited his practice to coroner work. Dr. Drake will not treat any patients in any capacity or prescribe any medication to any person.

The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.