skip to content

Drake, Madeline Jane

CPSO#: 98764

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pediatric Health Experts
30 Prospect Street, Suite 200
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone: 905-235-7284
Fax: 905-235-7320 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Center
Department of Pediatrics
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: 905-895-4521 Ext. 2617
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Madeline Drake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Drake ( CPSO# 98764 )

Business Address:
Pediatrics Health Experts
200 - 30 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone Number: (905) 235-7284

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Pediatrics
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
30 Bond Street, 15th Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (647) 391-3930

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MADELINE JANE DRAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2017