skip to content

Drake, James Mckenzie

CPSO#: 32081

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jul 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Suite 1504
Department Of Neurosurgery
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6125
Fax: (416) 813-4975 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. James Drake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Drake ( CPSO# 32081 )

Business Address:
The Hospital For Sick Children
Department of Neurosurgery
Suite 1504
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6125

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES MCKENZIE DRAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1985