skip to content

Drake, Brian James

CPSO#: 93467

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C2183 - 1053 Carling Ave
Division of Neurosurgery
The Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613 798 5555 Ext. 16323
Fax: 613 761 4603 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brian Drake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Drake ( CPSO# 93467 )
Dr. R. Osborne ( CPSO# 100327)

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
1053 Carling Avenue
Room C2183
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN JAMES DRAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2016