Dragicevic, Todor Tode (CPSO#: 99896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Feb 2013

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Zagreb, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Todor Dragicevic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Dragicevic ( CPSO# 99896 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Feb 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Todor  Tode  Dragicevic may practise medicine independently in psychiatry,
            only.