skip to content

Doyle, William Leo

CPSO#: 28722

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Aug 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
915 Dorchester Drive
Sarnia ON  N7V 3A2
Phone: (519) 542-8957 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: William L. Doyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Doyle ( CPSO# 28722 )
Dr. S. Doyle ( CPSO# 101993)

Business Address:
915 Dorchester Drive
Sarnia ON  N7V 3A2
Phone Number: (519) 542-8957

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM LEO DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Apr 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1978