skip to content

Doyle, Vanessa Semone

CPSO#: 98639

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nepean Medical Centre
407-1 Centrepointe Dr
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: 6135626390
Fax: 6135626384 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
MS Clinic, 4th Floor
501 Smyth Rd.
Ottawa ON  K1H8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8532 Ext. 0
Fax: (613) 739-6631
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan St. North
Renfrew ON  K7V1P6
Canada
Phone: 6134324851 Ext. 772
Fax: 6134335723
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: V. Doyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Doyle ( CPSO# 98639 )

Business Address:
Nepean Medical Centre
407 - 1 CentrePointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 562-6390

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
MS Clinic
4th Floor
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8532

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 21 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VANESSA SEMONE DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017