skip to content

Doyle, Patricia Marian

CPSO#: 32976

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Nov 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813 2200 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp.
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 905 845 2571
Fax: 905 338 4146
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P.M. Doyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Doyle ( CPSO# 32976 )

Business Address:
Suite 502
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PATRICIA MARIAN DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1981