Doyle, Marijane (CPSO#: 32966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Apr 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 1981

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 Concession Street
Suite 2-1
Hamilton ON  L8V 1A8
Phone: (905) 387-0831
Fax: (905) 522-0464
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIJANE DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1981

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 22, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)