skip to content

Downie, Mallory Lorraine

CPSO#: 98306

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Great Ormond Street Hospital
Great Ormond St
Holborn
London WC1N3JH
United Kingdom
Phone: +44 2074059200

Additional Practice Location(s)

University College London
Royal Free Hospital
Rowland Hill Street
London NW3 2PF
United Kingdom
United Kingdom
County: 
Electoral District: 

Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: 4164618272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MALLORY LORRAINE DOWNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWNIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2017