skip to content

Downes, Michelle Rose

CPSO#: 98940

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Apr 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Apr 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
E 400
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 87597
Fax: (416) 480-4271 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:02 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2017 Active
             Dr.  Michelle  Rose  Downes  may  practise medicine independently in anatomical
            pathology.