skip to content

Downe Schwanz, Joan Irene

CPSO#: 29698

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 May 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 May 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Names: Pivnick, Joan Irene (used until: 02 Nov 1995 )     Downe, Joan Irene (used until: 01 Apr 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 May 2004