skip to content

Dowhaniuk, Jenna Katherine

CPSO#: 95090

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
1200 Main Street West
2N49
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: 905 521 2655 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNA KATHERINE DOWHANIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWHANIUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2015